THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 15:45:59 PM
Ho, May Tze-May
CPSO#:
30554
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Mar 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Toronto, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Feb 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Mar 1983 |