THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:33:31 PM
Ross, Michael Stephen
CPSO#:
30515
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Dec 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1209-170 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON M5R 0A4
Phone: 14165678141
Fax: none
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:15 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL STEPHEN ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 1978 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Apr 1984
Summary:
In April 1984, Dr. Ross pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21). Dr. Ross also pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Discipline Committee accepted these pleas and found Dr. Ross guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Ross' licence to practice be suspended for a period of two months. The Committee also ruled that for a period of thirty months conditions be placed on Dr. Ross' licence, such that all new female potential patients under the age of thirty years would be discussed with, and approved by, a specialist psychiatrist who would in turn report to the Registrar at six-monthly intervals indicating an acceptable standard of patient care. During this period, Dr. Ross was also to waive his right of confidentiality with his psychoanalyst, and direct him to submit a report to the Registrar at intervals of six months, outlining his progress in therapy. Failure to meet these conditions would result in revocation of licence. The Committee further ordered that these penalties be recorded on the Register, and recommended that the Doctor's name be published.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 02 Apr 1984