THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:33:20 PM
David, Tirone Esperidiao
CPSO#:
30513
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1975
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Dec 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Federal Do Parana, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
4N - 453
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5062
Fax: (416) 340-4020
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TIRONE ESPERIDIAO DAVID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVID is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Dec 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 1978 |