THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:12:20 PM
Roberts, Robert James
CPSO#:
30461
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Queen's University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:79 Bedford Street, Westport, ON X0G 1X0
Date Received: 06 Aug 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Apr 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2015 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: October 16, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert James Roberts to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 16, 2015.
Dr. Roberts was the subject of a College investigation into allegations that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Roberts resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
See PDF for full Undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)