THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:20:05 PM
McCormack, Brian Cornelius
CPSO#:
30431
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Jul 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Nov 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jul 2020 |