THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:39:08 AM
Marcuzzi, Alfonso
CPSO#:
30403
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Sep 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian, Spanish
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Marcuzzi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 8 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:2425 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6S 4W4
Date Received: 26 Jul 2019
Instructions/Address:
Paitents who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may send a request to:
501 - 2425 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6S 4W4
Tel: 416-767-9396
Date Received: 27 Feb 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:22 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jul 2019 |