THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:35:09 PM
Colgan, Terence John
CPSO#:
30383
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Mar 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Sep 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6303 McNiven Rd
Burlington ON L7P 0K1
Phone: 4164029093
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Colgan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 11 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:08 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2023 |