THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 22:54:13 PM
Masellis, Antony
CPSO#:
30325
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Mar 1976
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Bologna, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
5293 Highway 7 East
Markham ON L3P 7M7
Phone: (905) 294-8011
Fax: (905) 294-8153
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTONY MASELLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASELLIS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Mar 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Mar 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |