THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:11:48 AM
Nordin, Christopher Eric
CPSO#:
30322
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 26 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 03 Nov 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 21 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 24 Jun 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jul 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: June 24, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Christopher Eric Nordin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 24, 2020:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Nordin’s prescribing practice. As a result of the investigation Dr. Nordin underwent remediation followed by a reassessment. The reassessment raised concerns about Dr. Nordin’s standard of practice in prescribing. As a result of the reassessment:
Dr. Nordin will not take on any new patients requiring Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and Monitored Drugs.
Dr. Nordin will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for three (3) months.
Dr. Nordin will engage in professional education in opioid prescribing and record keeping.
Dr. Nordin’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Member
Active Date: May 21, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Christopher Eric Nordin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 21, 2019:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Nordin engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent his general practice. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Nordin must not practise any of the following: psychotherapy, and counselling.
Dr. Nordin will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.
Dr. Nordin will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping.
Dr. Nordin’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
Dr. Nordin shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Nordin must not practise any of the following: psychotherapy, and counselling. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.
Download Full Document (PDF)