THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:18:43 AM
Aldis, Ann Elizabeth
CPSO#:
30321
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Sep 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Sep 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mcgill University Health Centre
Department of Radiology Glen Site
1001 Decarie Blvd
Montreal QC H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 934-1934
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:23 May 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANN ELIZABETH ALDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALDIS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Aug 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 1987 |