THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 9:46:13 AM
Wong, Frank Gee
CPSO#:
30309
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
07 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
C-309 Commissioners Rd W
London ON N6J 1Y4
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Frank G. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 28 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1981 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2022 |