THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:24:53 AM
McElgunn, Patrick Shane James
CPSO#:
30272
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 May 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 May 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
5815 Blakeney Park Drive
Charlotte NC 28277
United States
Phone: (704) 542-2220
Fax: (704) 542-3304
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - North Carolina
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:22 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PATRICK SHANE JAMES MCELGUNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCELGUNN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Oct 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 1982 |