THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:07:28 AM
McGowan, Hugh Douglas
CPSO#:
30262
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jul 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jul 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
18-740, Ocular Oncology Service
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000 Ext. 4802
Fax: (416) 946-2189
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 08 May 2013
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:25 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HUGH DOUGLAS MCGOWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGOWAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1978 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Apr 2004
Summary:
On April 16, 2004, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. McGowan committed acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional by representing in his applications to the North York General Hospital that he was a member of the Canadian Medical Protective Association, when he was not in fact a member and falsifying a document indicating that he was a such a member.
The Committee ordered a reprimand, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 16, 2004