THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:11:34 AM
Cameron, Nancy Elizabeth
CPSO#:
30255
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Apr 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:8 - 134 Mitchell Court
Mitchell, ON N0K 1N0
Date Received: 19 May 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 12, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Nancy Elizabeth Cameron to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 12, 2017:
Dr. Cameron has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.