THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 20:13:55 PM
Hsu, Patrick Sung Lung
CPSO#:
30219
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Sep 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Mississippi
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1977 to 12 Jun 1978
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jul 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 May 2021 |