THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:13:38 AM
Ng, Kelvin Kai Kwong
CPSO#:
30146
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Mar 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Feb 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2024 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Feb 2024 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Mar 2024 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 9, 2024
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kelvin Kai Kwong Ng to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 9, 2024.
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Ng’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Ng has resigned from the College, effective March 17, 2024, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)