THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:31:49 AM
Goldfinger, Morris
CPSO#:
30126
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jun 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
36 Hillhurst Blvd
Toronto ON M5N 1N6
Phone: 6478122914
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:13 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 28 Jul 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 09 Aug 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 09 Aug 2013 |
|
Active |