THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:38:25 PM
Lewis, William Frederick
CPSO#:
30108
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Jun 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:17 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1977 to 14 Jun 1978
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2015 |