THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 23:40:29 PM
Riegert, Daniel Gerald
CPSO#:
30104
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite M3 200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:21 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL GERALD RIEGERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIEGERT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1976 to 14 Jun 1977
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 31 Dec 1977
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1978 |