THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:06:59 PM
Davis, Geoffrey Brian
CPSO#:
30066
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Oct 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Geoffrey Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 29 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Oct 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: October 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Geoffrey Brian Davis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 19, 2017:
The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Davis’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.
Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Davis failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Davis will not take on any new patients with chronic non-cancer pain, with the exception of new patients whose care he assumes for the purpose of providing palliative care.
Dr. Davis’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and
other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for minimum of nine (9) months.
Dr. Davis will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.
Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Davis’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.