THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:42:59 PM
Jones, Victoria Jennifer
CPSO#:
30059
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Victoria Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 30 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS
www.recordssolutions.ca
tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 03 Jan 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:25 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2023 |