THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 14:05:11 PM
Wu, Hing-Tung Tony
CPSO#:
30054
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: September 6, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Hing-Tung Tony Wu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 6, 2017:
Dr. Wu has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: August 12, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)