THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:50:16 AM
Wong, Edmund Kong-Yu
CPSO#:
30049
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Jun 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: E.K.Y. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact: 1637 Woodroffe Avenue, Suite 201, Ottawa, ON, K2G 1W2 or via telephone at 613-226-2279
Date Received: 16 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1978 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |