THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 21:09:24 PM
Khan, Mahmuda Begum
CPSO#:
30040
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jan 1975
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Dec 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili, Urdu
Education: University of Nairobi, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
151 Yonge St
Tia Health - Virtual Clinic
Toronto ON M5C 2W7
Phone: 437 266 9242
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1978 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAHMUDA BEGUM KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 May 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 2019 |