THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:25:52 AM
Pyne, Dennis Anthony
CPSO#:
30033
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Nov 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:10 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:28 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:24 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1978 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee |
Effective: 07 Jan 2004 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 09 Nov 2004 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2005 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Nov 2004
Summary:
On November 8, 2004, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Pyne committed acts of professional misconduct in that:
(a) he practised while knowing that he has deficient clinical ability;
(b) he practised during the period after he was notified by the College that he has deficient clinical ability and before he was notified by the College that he no longer has deficient clinical ability; and
(c) he committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful.
The Discipline Committee imposed the following penalty:
1. The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Pyne to attend before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded.
2. The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Pyne(s certificate of registration for a period of 10 months which will include the period during which Dr. Pyne(s license was interimly suspended; the suspension will cease on November 9, 2004.
3. The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Pyne(s certificate of registration:
(a) that Dr. Pyne abide by the recommendation of the Quality Assurance Committee that he cease and desist practice, unless and until that recommendation is changed, at which time he shall abide by any other recommendation made by the Quality Assurance Committee.
4. The Discipline Committee directs that Dr. Pyne pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00.
5. The Discipline Committee further directs that the results of this proceeding be recorded on the public Register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 08, 2004
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Jun 2002
Summary:
On June 24, 2002, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Pyne(s plea of guilt and found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession . By way of accepting a joint submission on penalty, the Discipline Committee ordered that:
1) Dr. Pyne be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register;
2) Dr. Pyne be referred to the Quality Assurance Committee and abide by the Committee(s recommendations and comply with any terms, limitations and conditions which that Committee may impose on his certificate of registration
3) Dr. Pyne pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00 by July 24, 2002; and,
4) Dr. Pyne will complete the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario Boundaries Course within the next 12 months.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 24, 2002