THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 7:23:30 AM
Knapp, Harvey Kelly
CPSO#:
29964
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Dec 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Enahnced Care Clinic
3857 Lakeshore Blvd W
Toronto ON M8W 0A2
Date Received: 30 Nov 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 18 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 27 May 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2021 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Dec 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: October 22, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Harvey Kelly Knapp to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 22, 2021:
Dr. Knapp resigned from the College effective December 1, 2021 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)