THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:35:35 PM
Abelsohn, Alan Ralph
CPSO#:
29948
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5R 3S3
Phone: (416) 483-8111
Fax: (416) 483-8182
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1978 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Executive Committee |
Effective: 04 Jun 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 15 Oct 2004 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 01 Dec 2004 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 01 Dec 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 14 Oct 2009 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Discipline Committee |
Effective: 14 Oct 2009 |
|
Active |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Aug 2004
Summary:
On August 3, 2004, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Abelsohn committed acts of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient (touching and behaviour of a sexual nature), engaged in acts relevant to the practise of medicine that having regard to all the circumstances would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional (various boundary violations). In addition, the Committee found Dr. Abelsohn to be incompetent as defined in subsection 52(1) of the Code.
On October 14, 2004, the Discipline Committee ordered the following:
1. The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Abelsohn s certificate of registration for a period of twelve (12) months, to commence on December 1, 2004.
2. The Discipline Committee directs that the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Abelsohn s certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time:
(a) Dr. Abelsohn must successfully complete a boundaries course acceptable to the College at his own expense before November 1, 2005;
(b) Dr. Abelsohn is prohibited from providing individual psychotherapy to patients, and from providing or billing for any service which should be billed under the OHIP codes applicable to individual psychotherapy, including K006 and K007. With respect to billing code K005, Dr. Abelsohn shall maintain a separate log by patient name of all services billed under Code K005, to be submitted to the Registrar within five days of the end of each month. Dr. Abelsohn may provide family or marital therapy to patients, but may only provide such treatment in the presence of two or more family members or individuals;
(c) Dr. Abelsohn will forthwith execute a consent in the form attached at Schedule A consenting to the release of his OHIP billing information to the College; and
(d) Dr. Abelsohn will co-operate with any medical inspector chosen by the College who may conduct random inspections of Dr. Abelsohn's OHIP billings and their supporting chart entries for specified codes and periods subsequent to the date of this Order of the inspector's choosing.
3. The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Abelsohn to attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register.
4. The Discipline Committee further orders that this proceeding be included in the Register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 01, 2003