THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:52:31 AM
Rodriguez, Carlos Horacio
CPSO#:
29904
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 May 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
106 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 4E4
Phone: 416-742-0680
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. C.H. Rodriguez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records are located at Docudavit and Etobicoke Brampton Sleep Clinic
Date Received: 01 Jun 2021
Instructions/Address:28 Eugene St
North York, ON M6B 3Z4
or
Tel: 416-781-9083 / Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 25 Jul 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:28 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: June 1, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Records are located at Docudavit and Etobicoke Brampton Sleep Clinic