THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:13:44 AM
Foote, Margaret Jane Grant
CPSO#:
29883
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 May 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Margaret J. G. Foote Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
11 George Street South, Cambridge, ON N1S 2N3
Date Received: 16 Jun 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 May 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |