THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 21:02:19 PM
Scott, Kirk John Irven
CPSO#:
29854
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Apr 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON N3T 3J2
Date Received: 10 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1978 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |