THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:31:13 AM
Derbyshire, George Edward
CPSO#:
29793
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Nov 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Nov 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100-710 Victoria Ave E
Thunder Bay ON P7C 5P7
Phone: 8076845101
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Fort Frances |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
McCausland Hospital |
Terrace Bay |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:11 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEORGE EDWARD DERBYSHIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DERBYSHIRE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Aug 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 1988 |