THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:51:36 PM
Dolan, Eugen James
CPSO#:
29783
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Feb 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Harnish Cres
North York ON M2M 2C1
Phone: 4066704438
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Montana
USA - Wyoming
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:03 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2023 |