Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Feb 2014
Summary:
On February 5, 2014, Dr. Woollam pleaded no contest to and the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Woollam committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in sexual abuse of a patient and in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all of the circumstances, would reasonably be regardded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional. Dr. Woollam admitted and the Discipline Committee found that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice.
Dr. Woollam was criminally charged on October 16, 2009 with sexual assault against Patient A, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code. He was convicted on November 24, 2010. Dr. Woollam received a twelve month conditional sentence, followed by probation for a term of one year. Dr. Woollam s practice has been restricted to male patients since January 5, 2011. Dr. Woollam unsuccessfully appealed the decision to the Divisional Court and to the Court of Appeal for Ontario. A panel of three judges of the Court of Appeal issued their reasons dismissing leave to appeal on November 21, 2013.
At the time of the incident Patient A was 21 years old. She had been a patient of Dr. Woollam s since 2005. Patient A was experiencing issues with kidney stones and ovarian cysts around the time of the incident. During a follow up examination with respect to her cysts, Dr. Woollam palpated her upper abdomen and checked her ovaries then began rubbing her stomach and talking to her. Dr. Woollam put his hand under her pants and underwear and began moving his fingers in a back and forth motion on her labia and clitoris. Dr. Woollam also touched her breast. Patient A described being scared and silent. Dr. Woollam told her that he was attracted to her and asked if she wanted to take things further. Patient A indicated that she did not and Dr. Woollam apologized repeatedly. Patient A told Dr. Woollam that he had crossed the line.
The Discipline Committe ordered and directed that:
the Registrar revoke Dr. Woollam s certificate of registration, effective immediately Dr. Woollam attend before the panel to be reprimanded Dr. Woollam reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College by May 5, 2014, in the amount of $16,060.00 Dr. Wollam pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within ninty (90) days of the date of this Order.