THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:48:36 AM
Leung, Alfred Ki-Wai
CPSO#:
29727
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Aug 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 311
The Tannery Centre
465 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P1
Phone: (905) 853-1031
Fax: (905) 853-1031
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALFRED KI-WAI LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 1977 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2002 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Nov 1984
Summary:
In November 1984, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Leung guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 26(20) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Leung be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee also ruled that the Doctor's licence to practice be suspended for a period of two months, but that this suspension would itself be suspended if Dr. Leung permitted an inspection of his practice, within three months from the date on which this Order became final, by inspectors appointed by the Registrar.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 19 Nov 1984