THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:10:14 PM
Humen, Dennis Paul
CPSO#:
29713
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dennis Humen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact the Division of Cardiology at London Health Sciences Centre at (519) 663-3671.
339 Windermere Road, London, ON N6A 5A5
Date Received: 10 Apr 2015
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:07 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
CF - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Aug 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |