THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:55:52 AM
Whiteside, Catharine Isobel
CPSO#:
29708
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
02 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Nov 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Nephrology |
Effective:06 Sep 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jan 2016 |