THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:32:00 AM
Grundmann, Hans Gerhard
CPSO#:
29707
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Jun 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jul 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:06 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Dec 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jun 2004 |