THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 6:47:01 AM
Downe Schwanz, Joan Irene
CPSO#:
29698
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 May 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Nov 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Pivnick, Joan Irene (used until: 02 Nov 1995 )
Downe, Joan Irene (used until: 01 Apr 1990 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1983 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Oct 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 May 2004 |