THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:21:03 AM
Kwok, Juanita Wan-Yee
CPSO#:
29660
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Oct 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: National Taiwan University, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Juanita W. Kwok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6
Website: http://www.rsrs.com
Tel: 416-398-0638
Fax: 416-398-5932
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 28 May 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |