THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:47:12 PM
Ho, Doris Shi-Chung
CPSO#:
29645
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Jan 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Dec 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 1977 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jan 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: December 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Doris Shi-Chung Ho to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective December 19, 2017:
A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Ho’s practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation:
Effective January 15, 2018 Dr. Ho resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.