THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:05:09 AM
Jarvis, Dorothy Marin Eirene Anna
CPSO#:
29582
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-4915
Fax: (416) 813-5043
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:09 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DOROTHY MARIN EIRENE ANNA JARVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARVIS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Dec 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 1977 |