THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:06:47 AM
Born, Abraham
CPSO#:
29560
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Aug 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Yiddish
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2888 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M6B 4H6
Fax: 437-317-9832
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical record requests for 4800 Leslie office may be addressed to: [email protected]
Date Received: 21 Jan 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:21 May 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABRAHAM BORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1976 to 17 Jun 1977
Resident 1 - General Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - General Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1977 |