THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:12:05 PM
McIsaac, Joseph Hugh
CPSO#:
29482
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Nov 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. Hugh McIsaac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. McIsaac has advised the College that patients looking for a copy of their medical record should contact:
Docudavit Solutions
P.O. Box 58045 RPO Dufferin
North York ON M6A 3C8
Telephone: 416-781-9083
Toll Free:1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Email: [email protected]
Website: www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 05 Dec 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1982 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Oct 2021 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2023 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 17 Aug 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2023 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2023 |