THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:03:29 AM
Rouf, Rehana Khatun
CPSO#:
29467
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
28 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rehana Rouf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 27 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
The Medical Records Department
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
206 John Street
Dunnville, Ontario
N1A 2P7
Date Received: 26 Jun 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1979 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Oct 2021 |