THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:34:51 AM
Belcon, Michael Carver
CPSO#:
29424
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jul 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Howard University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7600 Weston Rd
Woodbridge ON L4L 8B7
Phone: 2893713500
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL CARVER BELCON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELCON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1977 |
Concerns
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: August 22, 2017
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:
On August 22, 2017, the Florida Board of Medicine approved and adopted a Settlement Agreement between Dr. Belcon and the Florida Department of Health as an Order of the Board. Dr. Belcon was alleged to have been terminated from the Florida Medicaid program, and the following penalties were imposed: a Letter of Concern; a fine of $3,000; and reimbursement of Department of Health incurred in the investigation and prosecution of the case. The College was notified of this finding by a report received on August 22, 2017.