THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 19:02:58 PM
Hussey, Andrew Alford
CPSO#:
29422
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Andrew A. Hussey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 6 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:234 Water St
Stratford ON
N5A 3C5
519 272 7527
Date Received: 06 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:09 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jun 2022 |