THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:16:15 AM
McFarthing, Anthony Martin
CPSO#:
29416
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Durham, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2003 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 27 Jan 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 12 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jun 2008 |