THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:14:13 AM
Cunningham, David George
CPSO#:
29403
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Nov 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:11 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1976 to 14 Jun 1977
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Nov 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2020 |