THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 5:35:54 AM
Fonberg, Eric Michael
CPSO#:
29392
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto
Ontario
M1E 4B9
Toronto ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7270
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1982 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1983 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIC MICHAEL FONBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONBERG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1977 |