THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 22:23:13 PM
Williams, David Cecil
CPSO#:
29300
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Nepali
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
83 Beryl Ave
Whitchurch-Stouffville ON L4A 7X8
Phone: 4169535440
Electoral District: 00
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Community Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID CECIL WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Apr 1996
Resident 4 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1977 |